MO HB1508 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain cottage food production operations to sell baked goods from their home without being subject to the state health and food laws and regulations
Title
Allows certain cottage food production operations to sell baked goods from their home without being subject to the state health and food laws and regulations
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-11 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1508&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1508I.htm |