MO HB1502 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows real property owners in the counties of Caldwell, Clinton, Daviess, and DeKalb to petition for the creation of an exhibition center and recreational facility district
Title
Allows real property owners in the counties of Caldwell, Clinton, Daviess, and DeKalb to petition for the creation of an exhibition center and recreational facility district
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Guest [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Rural Community Development (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1502&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1502I.htm |