MO HB1498 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding liquor sales

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding liquor sales

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
2012-07-10 Approved by Governor (G)
2012-05-30 Delivered to Governor
2012-05-30 Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
2012-05-30 Signed by House Speaker(H)
2012-05-18 Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 095 NOES: 053
2012-05-18 House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 097 NOES: 050
2012-05-15 Reported to the House with... (S) - SS
2012-05-15 Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 27 NAYS: 07
2012-05-15 SS Adopted (S)
2012-05-15 Senate Substitute Offered (S)
2012-05-10 Reported Do Pass (S)
2012-05-10 Executive Session Held (S)
2012-05-10 Public Hearing Held (S)
2012-05-09 Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 10, 8:30AM, SCR 1
2012-05-02 Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S)
2012-05-01 SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2012-04-25 Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2012-04-18 Public Hearing Held (S)
2012-04-17 Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, NOON, SENATE LOUNGE
2012-04-05 Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S)
2012-04-02 Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2012-03-29 Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 097 NOES: 044
2012-03-28 Perfected (H)
2012-03-28 HCS Adopted (H)
2012-03-22 Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2012-03-22 Rules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2012-03-22 Rules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2012-03-01 Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
2012-03-01 HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2012-03-01 HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2012-03-01 Executive Session Completed (H)
2012-02-28 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2012-02-06 Referred: General Laws (H)
2012-01-26 Read Second Time (H)
2012-01-25 Introduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback