MO HB1498 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the payment of health insurance claims
Title
Changes the laws regarding the payment of health insurance claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-04-27 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-04-13 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-13 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-04-13 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-04-07 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-03-25 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 29, 2010, UPON ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2010-03-18 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2010-02-25 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-02-25 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 157 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 158 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-16 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled (H) |