MO HB1478 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to money transmission
Title
Establishes provisions relating to money transmission
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Christ [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |