MO HB1477 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Approved by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Approved by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends laws relating to elections and political parties
Title
Amends laws relating to elections and political parties
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 117 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 119 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 125 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 119 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 125 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: HB 1477 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-10 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 125 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 119 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 117 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 4, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2016-02-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-22 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 90 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-22 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-17 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |