MO HB1469 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the Missouri military code by changing the name of the "Missouri reserve military force" to the "Missouri state defense force"
Title
Modifies provisions of the Missouri military code by changing the name of the "Missouri reserve military force" to the "Missouri state defense force"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 1469 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 19, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 12, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans’ and Military Affairs(S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-28 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |