MO HB1459 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the appropriations for small schools by specifying that the calculation is to be based on their regular-term average daily attendance rather than the full year's average daily attendance
Title
Revises the appropriations for small schools by specifying that the calculation is to be based on their regular-term average daily attendance rather than the full year's average daily attendance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-21 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1459&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1459I.htm |