MO HB1457 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, except in a charter county, a candidate for county treasurer to file a signed affidavit stating that the candidate meets the minimum bond requirements for the office of county treasurer
Title
Requires, except in a charter county, a candidate for county treasurer to file a signed affidavit stating that the candidate meets the minimum bond requirements for the office of county treasurer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 26, 2012, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-02-22 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 003 | |
2012-02-20 | Perfected by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-08 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |