MO HB1442 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 To SS for SCS pending
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 To SS for SCS pending
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the filling of commissioner offices
Title
Changes the laws regarding the filling of commissioner offices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: HB 1442 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1442 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: HB 1442 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 To SS for SCS pending |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-04-05 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 27, 2018, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Local Government and Elections(S) |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-06 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted AYES: 98 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 2 |
2018-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to county government |
2018-03-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass - Not Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass - Not Consent (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |