MO HB1439 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a transient guest tax for tourism purposes in Harrisonville upon voter approval
Title
Authorizes a transient guest tax for tourism purposes in Harrisonville upon voter approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |