MO HB1435 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows electrical corporations to charge for services based on the costs of certain construction work in progress
Title
Allows electrical corporations to charge for services based on the costs of certain construction work in progress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3 |
2024-02-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |