MO HB1435 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Health Care Policy (H)
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Health Care Policy (H)
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of members on the Missouri Consolidated Health Care Plan Board of Trustees by replacing the current six gubernatorial appointees with nine appointees, one from each Congressional district
Title
Increases the number of members on the Missouri Consolidated Health Care Plan Board of Trustees by replacing the current six gubernatorial appointees with nine appointees, one from each Congressional district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-18 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1435&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1435I.htm |