MO HB1432 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a hearing to be held within 60 days if a state employee is placed on administrative leave
Title
Requires a hearing to be held within 60 days if a state employee is placed on administrative leave
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Vescovo [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 126 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 126 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: HB 1432 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-28 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 118 NOES: 22 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS#2 AYES: 126 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SS for SCS pending |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-28 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 19, 2016, 12:00pm, SCR 2 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2016-03-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-03-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |