MO HB1431 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes minimum teacher's salaries and provides grant moneys to assist school districts with increasing teacher salaries
Title
Establishes minimum teacher's salaries and provides grant moneys to assist school districts with increasing teacher salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |