MO HB1431 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the provisions regarding the sales tax exemption on the sale of aviation jet fuel and authorizes the City of Columbia to impose a transient guest tax
Title
Extends the expiration of the provisions regarding the sales tax exemption on the sale of aviation jet fuel and authorizes the City of Columbia to impose a transient guest tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |