MO HB143 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred: Economic Development(H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred: Economic Development(H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sunset date of the Manufacturing Jobs Act
Title
Extends the sunset date of the Manufacturing Jobs Act
Sponsors
Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB143&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0191H.01I.pdf |