MO HB1429 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding a no-contest clause in a will or trust
Title
Changes the laws regarding a no-contest clause in a will or trust
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1429&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1429I.htm |