MO HB1425 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Tourism (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Tourism (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the day after Thanksgiving Day until midnight December 26 of each year as the "Christmas Season" in Missouri
Title
Designates the day after Thanksgiving Day until midnight December 26 of each year as the "Christmas Season" in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Tourism (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-17 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1425&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1425I.htm |