MO HB1420 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission on the death penalty and places a moratorium on all executions until January 1, 2015
Title
Establishes a commission on the death penalty and places a moratorium on all executions until January 1, 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Colona [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1420&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1420I.htm |