MO HB1416 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Refer: Spec Stand Com on Workforce Dev & Workplace Safety(H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Refer: Spec Stand Com on Workforce Dev & Workplace Safety(H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Worker Freedom Act which prohibits employers from requiring employees to participate in meetings or communications regarding the employer's opinions on religious or political matters
Title
Establishes the Missouri Worker Freedom Act which prohibits employers from requiring employees to participate in meetings or communications regarding the employer's opinions on religious or political matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Refer: Spec Stand Com on Workforce Dev & Workplace Safety(H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-17 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1416&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1416I.htm |