MO HB1415 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds provisions relating to health care costs.
Title
Adds provisions relating to health care costs.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Helms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1415&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3320H.04I.pdf |