MO HB1407 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to standards and guidelines established by the air conservation commission.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to standards and guidelines established by the air conservation commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1407&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3692H.01I.pdf |