MO HB1407 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Sickle Cell Standing Committee to study and make recommendations regarding the impact of sickle cell disease on urban communities, examine existing services, and address any needs
Title
Establishes the Sickle Cell Standing Committee to study and make recommendations regarding the impact of sickle cell disease on urban communities, examine existing services, and address any needs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-15 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-04-16 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 16, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 1 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |