MO HB1406 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals a provision relating to insurance.
Title
Repeals a provision relating to insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1406&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4876H.01I.pdf |