MO HB1405 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Universal Health Assurance Program to provide a publicly financed, statewide insurance program for all residents of this state
Title
Establishes the Missouri Universal Health Assurance Program to provide a publicly financed, statewide insurance program for all residents of this state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1405&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1405I.htm |