MO HB1400 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows camping trailers more than twenty-five years old to be permanently registered and be issued historic trailer license plates
Title
Allows camping trailers more than twenty-five years old to be permanently registered and be issued historic trailer license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House: HB 1400 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 6, 2016, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-14 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-03-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |