MO HB1397 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Supporting Families Income Tax Holiday Act which allows an exemption from state withholding taxes for state employees in a specified month determined by the Department of Revenue
Title
Establishes the Missouri Supporting Families Income Tax Holiday Act which allows an exemption from state withholding taxes for state employees in a specified month determined by the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1397&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1397I.htm |