MO HB1396 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits political subdivisions from adopting ordinances restricting the use of plastic bags or other disposable containers.
Title
Prohibits political subdivisions from adopting ordinances restricting the use of plastic bags or other disposable containers.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Shaul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |