MO HB1389 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Manufacturing Infrastructure Investment Act, which allows certain businesses to retain withholding taxes
Title
Establishes the Manufacturing Infrastructure Investment Act, which allows certain businesses to retain withholding taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Nick King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1389&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1389I.PDF |