MO HB1380 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-07 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Jackson County to create a jury service expense fund for expenses related to the compensation of jurors and revises the rate of their compensation based on the number of days they serve
Title
Requires Jackson County to create a jury service expense fund for expenses related to the compensation of jurors and revises the rate of their compensation based on the number of days they serve
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Salva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-04-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-31 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-16 | Prefiled (H) |