MO HB138 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding virtual education
Title
Changes the laws regarding virtual education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House: HB 138 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 138 (*HSA 1 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 46 N: 107 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 138 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 45 N: 106 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 138 (*HSA 1 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 46 N: 107 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: HB 138 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 45 N: 106 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 11, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2017-02-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-21 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2017-02-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill Reconsidered (H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |