MO HB1375 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates June 27 of each year as "Post Traumatic Stress Awareness Day" in Missouri.
Title
Designates June 27 of each year as "Post Traumatic Stress Awareness Day" in Missouri.
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Ruth [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1375 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-07 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |