MO HB1371 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any district with a state-approved gifted education program to have a process that allows parents or guardians to appeal a determination that their child does not qualify for gifted services
Title
Requires any district with a state-approved gifted education program to have a process that allows parents or guardians to appeal a determination that their child does not qualify for gifted services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: HB 1371 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-14 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |