MO HB137 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all state agencies to obtain approval from the General Assembly prior to administering, implementing, or expanding any federal program
Title
Requires all state agencies to obtain approval from the General Assembly prior to administering, implementing, or expanding any federal program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 1, 2013, 1:30PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 22 |
2013-04-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |