MO HB1367 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-07 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 9, UPON AFTERNOON RECESS SCR 1
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-07 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 9, UPON AFTERNOON RECESS SCR 1
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that any state employee performance review, if conducted, must be done by the employer or supervisor
Title
Specifies that any state employee performance review, if conducted, must be done by the employer or supervisor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 9, UPON AFTERNOON RECESS SCR 1 | |
2012-04-26 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2012-04-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 5 | |
2012-04-18 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-18 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) - EXECUTIVE SESSION COMPLETED ON MARCH 5,2012 | |
2012-03-05 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-20 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |