MO HB1364 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to hazardous waste fees paid to the Missouri Emergency Response Commission
Title
Modifies provisions relating to hazardous waste fees paid to the Missouri Emergency Response Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1364 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1364 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 1364 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1364 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 1364 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-18 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 118 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 115 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-17 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported to the House (H) - SS |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 8, 2018, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 1:00 p.m., Wednesday, April 4, 2018, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-07 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-07 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |