MO HB1362 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Public Safety (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Public Safety (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows criminal investigators of the Criminal Investigation Bureau within the Department of Revenue to be appointed by the department director as peace officers and to carry firearms at all times
Title
Allows criminal investigators of the Criminal Investigation Bureau within the Department of Revenue to be appointed by the department director as peace officers and to carry firearms at all times
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Bruns [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-14 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1362&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1362I.htm |