MO HB1357 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 17, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 17, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the constitutions and laws of the United States and Missouri must protect the rights of an alternatives-to-abortion agency and its officers to freely engage in activities without interference
Title
Specifies that the constitutions and laws of the United States and Missouri must protect the rights of an alternatives-to-abortion agency and its officers to freely engage in activities without interference
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 17, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-05-16 | Second Rd/Refer: Government Accountability &Fisc Oversght(S) | |
2012-05-15 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 34 | |
2012-05-08 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |