MO HB1345 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Secretary of State to enter into an agreement with a nonprofit organization to print and distribute the Official State Manual
Title
Allows the Secretary of State to enter into an agreement with a nonprofit organization to print and distribute the Official State Manual
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 1:30PM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |