MO HB1344 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a person to apply to a court for the closure of certain criminal records
Title
Authorizes a person to apply to a court for the closure of certain criminal records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-30 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Re-committed to Committee (H) - URBAN ISSUES COMMITTEE AYES: 139 NOES: 002 | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-21 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-20 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-20 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2012-02-06 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred: Urban Issues | |
2012-01-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |