MO HB1337 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of State Highway U in Washington County as the "Thomas Wesley Benoist Memorial Highway"
Title
Designates a portion of State Highway U in Washington County as the "Thomas Wesley Benoist Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |