MO HB1336 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
Pending: House Corrections and Public Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
Pending: House Corrections and Public Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the costs chargeable to the state by counties and the city of St. Louis for the boarding of certain prisoners
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the costs chargeable to the state by counties and the city of St. Louis for the boarding of certain prisoners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1336&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5042H.01I.pdf |