MO HB1334 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Fair Fare Passenger Safety Act of 2012 which prohibits any person operating a motor vehicle for compensation and transporting passengers from using a hand-held wireless communications device
Title
Establishes the Fair Fare Passenger Safety Act of 2012 which prohibits any person operating a motor vehicle for compensation and transporting passengers from using a hand-held wireless communications device
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-11 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1334&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1334I.htm |