MO HB1333 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a procedure for the removal and disposal of abandoned aircraft on airport property.
Title
Establishes a procedure for the removal and disposal of abandoned aircraft on airport property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: HB 1333 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:15 am, Thursday, April 30, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-02-25 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA1 to HA 2, HA 2 as amended, HA 3, and HA 4 adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |