MO HB1330 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a landlord and tenant can include a provision in the rental agreement regarding agreed upon fees for certain cleaning services
Title
Specifies that a landlord and tenant can include a provision in the rental agreement regarding agreed upon fees for certain cleaning services
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Cross [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - HB 1330 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 115 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - HB 1330 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - HB 1330 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - HB 1330 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - HB 1330 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - HB 1330 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - HB 1330 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-05-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-05-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |