MO HB133 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Entertainment Industry Jobs Act
Title
Establishes the Entertainment Industry Jobs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Hudson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - House: HB 133 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 110 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 26, 2023, 9:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 3, 2023, 2:15 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Economic Development and Tax Policy(S) |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 2 |
2023-03-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |