MO HB1327 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the consent requirements for obtaining an abortion and creates the crime of coercing an abortion
Title
Changes the laws regarding the consent requirements for obtaining an abortion and creates the crime of coercing an abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-25 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-25 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-22 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-25 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-25 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - MOTION TO DO PASS RECONSIDERED | |
2010-02-25 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred: Spec Standing Committee on Children & Families (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-04 | Prefiled (H) |