MO HB1317 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a person commits the crime of child abuse if he or she knowingly causes physical injury to a child which results in abusive head trauma
Title
Specifies that a person commits the crime of child abuse if he or she knowingly causes physical injury to a child which results in abusive head trauma
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-01 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-13 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 16, 2012, UPON ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-22 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2012-03-08 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-08 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-06 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-29 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-14 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |