MO HB1316 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a peace officer to provide an oral advisement and obtain written consent for a voluntary search of a person not under arrest or the person's effects or vehicle
Title
Requires a peace officer to provide an oral advisement and obtain written consent for a voluntary search of a person not under arrest or the person's effects or vehicle
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Mitten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1316&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4335H.01I.pdf |